+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 3, 2019 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B23-0131
On May 3, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On April 12, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On February 15, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0131 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On February 5, 2019 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
- B23-0131 Introduced by Councilmembers T. White, and Gray at Committee of the Whole