+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On July 8, 2015 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B21-0125
On June 12, 2015 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On May 22, 2015 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 13, 2015 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0125 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 3, 2015 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
- B21-0125 Introduced by Councilmembers Alexander, Allen, Evans, and Cheh at Legislative Meeting