+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On December 3, 2013 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On November 25, 2013 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B20-0123
On July 1, 2013 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B20-0123
On June 21, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On February 15, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0123 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On February 5, 2013 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
- B20-0123 Introduced by Councilmembers Alexander, Barry, Bonds, Evans, Graham, and McDuffie at Legislative Meeting
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor