+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 4, 2022 in the Council:
- Law L24-0051, Effective from Feb 18, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001668
On January 6, 2022 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress
On December 31, 2021 in the Council:
- Act A24-0259 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 014087
On December 27, 2021 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On December 22, 2021 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0259
On December 15, 2021 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 30, 2021
On December 7, 2021 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On November 2, 2021 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On October 25, 2021 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On October 21, 2021 in the Council:
- Mark-up on B24-0111
- Committee Mark-up of B24-0111
- Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
On April 19, 2021 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B24-0111 View Public Hearing Record
- Public Hearing on B24-0111
On April 9, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On April 1, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On March 19, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 11, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On March 5, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0111 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 2, 2021 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On February 25, 2021 in the Council:
- B24-0111 Introduced by Councilmembers Lewis George, Allen, Nadeau, Henderson, Bonds, R. White, and McDuffie at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
December 7, 2021: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
November 2, 2021: First Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes