+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (5)
On June 26, 2019 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
On June 25, 2019 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B23-0102
On February 8, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0102 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On February 5, 2019 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Health, and Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
On January 22, 2019 in the Council:
- B23-0102 Introduced by Councilmembers Grosso, Nadeau, and Gray at Committee of the Whole