+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (11)
On December 20, 2022 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On December 6, 2022 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On November 21, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On November 17, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B24-1000
On November 16, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
On October 27, 2022 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B24-1000 View Public Hearing Record
On October 7, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 4, 2022 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On October 3, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On September 30, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B24-1000 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On September 19, 2022 in the Council:
- B24-1000 Introduced by Councilmember Cheh at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
December 6, 2022: Cheh Amendment
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Absent
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
December 6, 2022: Final Reading
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Absent
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor