+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 11, 2020 in the Council:
- Law L23-0127, Effective from Aug 27, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 10918
On July 16, 2020 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress
On February 14, 2020 in the Council:
- Act A23-0217 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 1360
On February 11, 2020 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0217
On January 31, 2020 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Feb 14, 2020
On October 8, 2019 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On July 9, 2019 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
- Committee Mark-up of B23-0001
On January 11, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0001 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 8, 2019 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee of the Whole
On January 3, 2019 in the Council:
- B23-0001 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
On March 20, 2018 in the Council:
- Roundtable on B23-0001 View Roundtable Record
+ − Votes (4)
October 8, 2019: Amendment (Mendelson)
- Yeas: 13
October 8, 2019: Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson)
- Yeas: 13
October 8, 2019: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
July 9, 2019: First Reading CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor