+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On November 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
- Substituted for S1991
On November 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
On March 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
On February 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 17, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
+ − Votes (5)
November 18, 2013: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
November 18, 2013: SUBSTITUTE FOR S1991
- Present/NV: 40
November 7, 2013: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
March 21, 2013: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
February 7, 2013: r/favorably
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor