+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2017, JR-5.
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0)
- Substituted for SJR16
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On September 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
On September 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (66-6-3)
On September 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On March 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
+ − Votes (5)
March 13, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
March 13, 2017: SUBSTITUTE FOR SJR16
- Present/NV: 40
February 27, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
September 15, 2016: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 5
September 8, 2016: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1