+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On July 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2017, JR-15.
On June 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0)
On November 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On November 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (36-0)
- Substituted for SJR31 (1R)
On October 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (35-0) (Bucco)
On September 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
On September 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading
+ − Votes (6)
June 22, 2017: CONCUR IN SA
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
November 14, 2016: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
November 14, 2016: SUBSTITUTE FOR SJR31
- Present/NV: 40
October 20, 2016: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
October 20, 2016: AMEND
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
September 15, 2016: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor