+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (7)
On August 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2017, c.229.
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0)
- Substituted for S3235 (1R)
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On March 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
+ − Votes (4)
June 29, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
June 29, 2017: SUBSTITUTE FOR S3235
- Present/NV: 40
March 23, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
March 20, 2017: r/Aca
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor