+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On August 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 25, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 1 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Laid On Table in Senate
- Lifted From Table in Senate
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 4 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 79
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor