+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On August 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 25, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 24 YES 12 NO 2 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
On June 19, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment SA 2 Introduced in Senate
- Amendment SA 2 Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 11 YES 9 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Laid On Table in Senate
- Lifted From Table in Senate
- Amendment SA 3 Introduced in Senate
- Amendment SA 3 Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 12 YES 4 NO 5 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 15 YES 4 NO 2 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Committee in Senate
- was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 68
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor