+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 4 On Its Merits
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 Introduced in Senate
- Amendment SA 1 Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 218
+ − Amendment
SA 1 to SS 1 for SB 218
Passed