+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (CORRECTIONS) in House with 8 Favorable
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Corrections Committee in House
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 Introduced in Senate
- Amendment SA 1 Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 13
+ − Amendment
SA 1 to SS 1 for SB 13
Passed
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor