+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On August 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 18, 2021 in the House:
- Suspension of Rules in House
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 6 Favorable
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor