+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On October 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 5 On Its Merits
On June 28, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
On June 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
July 1, 2016: House Vote
- Yeas: 39
June 23, 2016: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 17
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor