+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Administration Committee in House
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 94 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 NO
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 94 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 2
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor