+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On August 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 92 - Signed by Governor
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 92 - Passed By House. Votes: 33 YES 7 NO 1 ABSENT
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 92 - Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 5 On Its Merits
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 92 - Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 92 - Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 7 On Its Merits
On June 7, 2019 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 92 - Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 92 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Substituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 92
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor