+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate
- Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
+ − Amendment
SA 1 to SB 92
Passed
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor