+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 13, 2019 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 7 On Its Merits
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judicial) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judicial Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor