+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On September 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 3 On Its Merits
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Lifted From Table in Senate
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Laid On Table in Senate
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate