+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (REVENUE & FINANCE) in House with 10 On Its Merits
- Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
July 1, 2013: SB 84 Henry Passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Absent: 1
June 11, 2013: SB 84 Henry Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21