+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate