+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 2 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
March 17, 2015: SB 8 Hall-Long Passed (House)
- Yeas: 41
January 22, 2015: SB 8 Hall-Long Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor