+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 25, 2015 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 79 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- SS 1 FOR SB 79 - Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 1 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 79 - Laid On Table in Senate
- SS 1 for SB 79 - Lifted From Table in Senate
- SS 1 for SB 79 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 4 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Substituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 79
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor