+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 11 On Its Merits
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor