+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Administration Committee in House
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 1 NO 2 ABSENT
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 1
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor