+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 3 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor