+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On August 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Suspension of Rules in Senate
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On July 2, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to SB 75 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to SB 75 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 8 On Its Merits
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (3)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor