+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On September 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On June 18, 2021 in the House:
- Suspension of Rules in House
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 73 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 73 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 5 Favorable
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor