+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 30, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 7 On Its Merits
- Suspension of Rules in House
- Amendment HA 1 to SB 71 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 NO
On June 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 71 - Stricken in Senate
- Amendment SA 2 to SB 71 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
- Amendment SA 3 to SB 71 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
- Amendment SA 4 to SB 71 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 2 NO 1 ABSENT
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 2 to SB 71 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 71 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (3)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 2
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 1
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor