+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 1 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment SA 2 - Introduced in Senate
- Amendment SA 2 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
- Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
+ − Amendments (2)
SA 2 to SB 7
Passed
SA 1 to SB 7
Passed
+ − Votes (3)
January 27, 2015: SA 1 to SB 7 Henry Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 1
January 27, 2015: SA 2 to SB 7 Henry Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 3
January 27, 2015: SB 7 w/SA 1, SA 2 Henry Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor