+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On August 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to SB 7 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Laid On Table in Senate
- Lifted From Table in Senate
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On June 13, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 7 On Its Merits
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 14 YES 6 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 7 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (3)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 6
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor