+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On July 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 33 YES 6 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 9 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate
- Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment SA 2 - Introduced in Senate
- Amendment SA 2 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Public Safety Committee in Senate
+ − Amendments (2)
SA 1 to SB 69
Passed
SA 2 to SB 69
Passed
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor