+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Suspension of Rules in House
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 6 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 6 Favorable
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41