+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On June 25, 2015 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 68 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 24 YES 12 NO 2 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 68 - Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 68 - Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- SS 1 for SB 68 - Amendment SA 2 - Introduced in Senate
- SS 1 for SB 68 - Amendment SA 2 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 11 YES 9 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- SS 1 for SB 68 - Laid On Table in Senate
- SS 1 for SB 68 - Lifted From Table in Senate
- SS 1 for SB 68 - Amendment SA 3 - Introduced in Senate
- SS 1 for SB 68 - Amendment SA 3 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 12 YES 4 NO 5 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- SS 1 for SB 68 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 15 YES 4 NO 2 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 68 - Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 68 - Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 68 - Assigned to Committee in Senate
- Substituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 68
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor