+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 4 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
+ − Vote
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20