+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Suspension of Rules in House
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 4 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 6 Favorable
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor