+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On October 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 65 - Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2021 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 65 - Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 29, 2021 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 65 - Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
On June 25, 2021 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 65 - Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 65 - Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
- SS 1 for SB 65 - - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
- SS 1 for SB 65 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On June 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 65 - Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Substituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 65
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 65 - Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Substituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 65
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor