+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 36 YES 0 NO 2 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 3 On Its Merits
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor