+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 2 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 8 On Its Merits
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
- Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate
- Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
+ − Amendment
SA 1 to SB 57
Passed
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor