+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On August 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 33 YES 3 NO 3 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 5 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor