+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor