+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On October 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 48 - Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2021 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 48 - Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 48 - Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 6 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 48 - Assigned to Labor Committee in House
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 48 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 48 - Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Substituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 48
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate