+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On September 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 9 On Its Merits
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor