+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On July 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to SB 44 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Passed By House. Votes: 34 YES 6 NO 1 ABSENT
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 7 On Its Merits
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (3)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20
: House Vote
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 6
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor