+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 9 On Its Merits
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (INSURANCE) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance Committee in Senate
+ − Amendment
SA 1 to SB 41
Passed
+ − Votes (3)
June 26, 2013: SB 41 w/SA 1 Bushweller Passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Absent: 1
May 15, 2013: SA 1 to SB 41 Bushweller Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
May 15, 2013: SB 41 w/SA 1 Bushweller Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21