+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Defeated by House of Representatives. Votes: Defeated 16 YES 23 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 - Stricken
- Amendment SA 2 - Introduced in Senate
- Amendment SA 2 defeated
- Amendment SA 2 - Defeated by Senate. Votes: Defeated 7 YES 11 NO 2 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment SA 3 - Introduced in Senate
- Amendment SA 3 defeated
- Amendment SA 3 - Defeated by Senate. Votes: Defeated 6 YES 13 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment SA 4 - Introduced in Senate
- Amendment SA 4 defeated
- Amendment SA 4 - Defeated by Senate. Votes: Defeated 7 YES 10 NO 3 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment SA 5 - Introduced in Senate
- Amendment SA 5 defeated
- Amendment SA 5 - Defeated by Senate. Votes: Defeated 8 YES 12 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 11 YES 9 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
+ − Amendments (5)
SA 1 to SB 40
Stricken
SA 2 to SB 40
Defeated
SA 3 to SB 40
Defeated
SA 4 to SB 40
Defeated
SA 5 to SB 40
Defeated
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor