+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 39 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 39 - Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 9 On Its Merits
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 39 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 39 - Reported Out of Committee (HIGHWAYS & TRANSPORTATION) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 39 - Re-Assigned to Highways & Transportation Committee in Senate
- Substituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 39
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Highways & Transportation Committee in Senate